CA SB614 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 534, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 534, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 987.8 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Criminal procedure: legal assistance: ability to pay.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Asm. Chad Mayes [I] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB614 Hertzberg Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-29 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Assembly - (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB614 Leno (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-29 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Assembly - (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB614 Leno (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 534, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2016-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5532.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-29 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 5501.) |
2016-08-27 | Senate | Set for hearing August 29. |
2016-08-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5448.) Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6275.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 23). |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Cooper. |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Cristina Garcia. |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2015-08-26 | Assembly | August 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (July 14). |
2015-07-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1191.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1157.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | April 27 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 651.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 987.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14045.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |