CA SB612 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - Re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - Re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 32282 of the Education Code, relating to school safety.
Title
School safety plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB612 Portantino et al (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2022-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | June 30 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 6. Page 1325.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1198.) (May 20). |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 17. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1. Page 916.) (April 26). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 32282 | Amended Code | Citation Text |