CA SB612 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 1348.7 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10125.5 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care: data reporting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateMay 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-04-29SenateApril 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-18SenateSet for hearing April 29.
2019-04-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 715.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-28SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2019-03-27SenateApril 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-03-19SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1348.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code10125.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback