CA SB612 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 452, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 452, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 25270.2, 25270.3, 25270.4.1, 25270.4.5, 25270.5, 25270.6, 25270.9, 25281, 25404, 25505, 25507, 25507.2, 25508.1, 25531.2, and 118330 of, and to add Section 25158.1 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous materials.
Title
Hazardous materials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB612 Jackson Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 612 Jackson Senate Third Reading By ALEJO (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB612 Jackson (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 612 Jackson Senate Third Reading By ALEJO (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB612 Jackson (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 452, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-15 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 a.m. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2684.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 2967.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-04 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 27). |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | July 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-23 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1208.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1157.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | April 27 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 650.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |