CA SB61 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - March 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 4.5 (commencing with Section 14050) to Chapter 3 of Division 7 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to job training.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workforce training programs: supportive services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-22SenateMarch 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-03-12SenateSet for hearing March 22.
2021-03-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-01SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2021-02-22SenateSet for hearing March 8.
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2020-12-08SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
2020-12-07SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Unemployment Insurance Code14050New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback