CA SB61 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Passed on September 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 350, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Passed on September 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 350, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Section 23702 of the Vehicle Code, relating to ignition interlock devices.
Title
Driving under the influence: ignition interlock device.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-31 - Assembly - SB 61 Hill Senate Third Reading By COOLEY (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB61 Hill (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB61 Hill (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 350, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2693.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1195.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1146.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | April 27 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | April 20 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 404.) (March 24). |
2015-03-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing March 24. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-01-05 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-12-30 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 29. |
2014-12-29 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 13352 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 13352.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 13353.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 13353.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 13353.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 13386 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 23103.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 23247 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 23573 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 23575 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 23576 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 23597 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 23702 | New Code | See Bill Text |