CA SB609 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 377, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 6980.17, 6981, 7502.6, 7504.7, 7506.10, 7511.5, 7523, 7523.5, 7528, 7532, 7541.2, 7542.2, 7564, 7570, 7573.5, 7576, 7583.2, 7583.6, 7583.8, 7583.9, 7583.10, 7583.12, 7583.15, 7583.16, 7583.19, 7583.20, 7583.23, 7585.8, 7587.8, 7587.15, 7588.6, 7588.8, 7590.5, 7591.9, 7596.3, 7596.7, 7596.81, and 7599.80 of, and to repeal and add Section 7571 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professions and vocations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB609 Glazer Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 609 Glazer Senate Third Reading By Low (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB609 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 377, Statutes of 2019.
2019-09-27 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-20SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
2019-09-13SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2929.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-12SenateFrom committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2908.)
2019-09-11SenateSet for hearing September 12.
2019-09-11SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2808.) Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-09-11SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
2019-09-10SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 2. Page 3324.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (August 30).
2019-08-21AssemblyAugust 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-11AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 1.) (July 9).
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1279.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-21SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1105.) (May 16).
2019-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-25SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 769.) (April 22).
2019-04-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-03-29SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code6980.17Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code6981Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7502.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7504.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7506.10Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7511.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7523Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7523.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7528Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7532Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7541.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7542.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7564Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7570Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7571Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7573.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7576Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7583.10Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7583.12Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7583.15Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7583.16Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7583.19Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7583.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7583.20Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7583.23Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7583.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7583.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7583.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7585.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7587.15Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7587.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7588.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7588.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7590.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7591.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7596.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7596.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7596.81Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7599.80Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback