CA SB606 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 348, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 11414 of the Penal Code, relating to harassment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Harassment: child or ward.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-09-06 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB606 De Le (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-03 - Assembly - SB 606 De Leon Senate Third Reading By PEREZ, J (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB606 De Le (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-09-24 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 348, Statutes of 2013.
2013-09-24 Approved by the Governor.
2013-09-11SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2013-09-06SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2164.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2013-09-03SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2013-09-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2838.) Ordered to the Senate.
2013-08-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-08-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 21).
2013-08-19AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-08-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2013-08-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2013-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 25).
2013-06-20AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-06-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2013-05-24SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1044.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2013-05-21SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-20SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2013-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2013-05-07SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-05-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 757.) (April 30).
2013-04-23SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2013-04-11SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-04-09SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2013-03-11SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2013-02-25SenateRead first time.
2013-02-24SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
2013-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code11414Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code16220Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_606&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_606_bill_20130222_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_606_bill_20130409_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_606_bill_20130507_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_606_bill_20130620_amended_asm_v96.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_606_bill_20130620_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_606_bill_20130222_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_606_bill_20130409_amended_sen_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_606_bill_20130507_amended_sen_v97.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_606_bill_20130620_amended_asm_v96.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_606_bill_20130805_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_606_bill_20130806_amended_asm_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_606_bill_20130819_amended_asm_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_606_bill_20130909_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_606_bill_20130924_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_606_vote_20130430_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_606_vote_20130524_1020AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_606_vote_20130625_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_606_vote_20130813_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_606_vote_20130821_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_606_vote_20130903_0106PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0601-0650/sb_606_vote_20130906_1105AM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback