CA SB604 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 5892 of, and to add Section 5848.3 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental Health Services Act: centers of excellence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateMay 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-04-22SenateApril 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-10SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2019-04-04SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 577.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-20SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code5848.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code5892Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback