CA SB601 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 854, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 11009.5 to the Government Code, relating to state government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State agencies: licenses: fee waiver.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-04 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB601 Morrell et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - SB 601 Morrell Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB601 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-12 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 854, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-12 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-10SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2019-09-04SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2529.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-04SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-08-30SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 2910.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-08-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2019-08-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21).
2019-07-11Assembly(Received at desk July 10 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)).
2019-07-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-27AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2019-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 25).
2019-06-03AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & P. and G.O.
2019-05-16AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-16SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1059.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2019-05-13SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-04-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 769.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-11SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2019-04-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 620.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-03-28SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2019-03-22SenateSet for hearing April 9.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Coms. on G.O. and B., P. & E.D.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code11009.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback