CA SB601 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2014 - 50% progression
Action: 2014-01-27 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 19817 and 19840 of, and to repeal Section 19818 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to gaming.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gambling policy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB601 Yee (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2014-01-27SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2654.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2014-01-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-01-21SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2014-01-15SenateSet for hearing January 21.
2014-01-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2590.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-01-09SenateSet for hearing January 14.
2014-01-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2013-03-11SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2013-02-25SenateRead first time.
2013-02-24SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
2013-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback