CA SB596 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 246, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 246, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 38561.2 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases.
Title
Greenhouse gases: cement sector: net-zero emissions strategy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB596 Becker et al. Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 596 Becker Senate Third Reading By Muratsuchi (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB596 Becker (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 596 Becker Senate Third Reading By Muratsuchi (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB596 Becker (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 246, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2559.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 2. Page 2918.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-09-03 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (August 26). |
2021-07-14 | Assembly | July 14 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 23). |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1233.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1197.) (May 20). |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 17. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 985.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | April 12 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 38561.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |