CA SB593 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Title 15.5 (commencing with Section 97000) of the Government Code, relating to social impact partnerships.
Title
Social impact partnerships: pilot program.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Lieu [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB593 Lieu Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Assembly - SB 593 Lieu Senate Third Reading By MEDINA (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB593 Lieu (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Assembly - SB 593 Lieu Senate Third Reading By MEDINA (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB593 Lieu (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2014-09-29 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2014-09-04 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4938.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 6492.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6342.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2014-01-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2685.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2645.) (January 23). |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Set for hearing January 23. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Set for hearing January 21. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2590.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Set for hearing January 14. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-01-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F., PUB. S., and RLS. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8203.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 97000 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |