CA SB59 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Chapter 1.5 (commencing with Section 14518) of Part 5.3 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Transportation Commission: advisory committee: autonomous vehicle technology.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Communications and Conveyance] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB59 Allen (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-14AssemblyAugust 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on C. & C.
2019-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 1).
2019-06-10AssemblyReferred to Coms. on TRANS. and C. & C.
2019-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 1194.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-05-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1088.) (May 16).
2019-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 843.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-04-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 655.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2019-04-01SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-03-22SenateSet for hearing April 9.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Coms. on TRANS. and EQ.
2019-01-07SenateRead first time.
2018-12-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 19.
2018-12-19SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code14518Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code65053New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback