CA SB589 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 736, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 2102, 2150, 2208, and 2209 of the Elections Code, and to amend Sections 1823, 1826, 1828, 1851, and 1910 of the Probate Code, relating to voting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voting: voter registration: individuals with disabilities and conservatees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB589 Block Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - SB 589 Block Senate Third Reading By MULLIN (Y: 62 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB589 Block (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-10-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 736, Statutes of 2015.
2015-10-10 Approved by the Governor.
2015-09-01SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2015-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2272.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2015-08-27SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2015-08-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 11. Page 2626.) Ordered to the Senate.
2015-08-20AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2015-07-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-07-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (July 15).
2015-07-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-07-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2015-06-18AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2015-06-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on E. & R. and JUD.
2015-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2015-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 1061.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2015-05-12SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-05-11SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2015-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 11.
2015-04-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 819.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-04-23SenateSet for hearing April 28.
2015-04-22SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2015-04-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 723.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2015-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 21.
2015-04-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2015-04-06SenateApril 7 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2015-03-24SenateSet for hearing April 7.
2015-03-12SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2015-02-27SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
2015-02-26SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_589&sess=1516&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_589_bill_20150226_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_589_bill_20150406_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_589_bill_20150618_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_589_bill_20150820_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_589_bill_20150831_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_589_bill_20151010_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_589_vote_20150421_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_589_vote_20150428_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_589_vote_20150522_0925AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_589_vote_20150701_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_589_vote_20150707_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_589_vote_20150715_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_589_vote_20150827_1034AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0551-0600/sb_589_vote_20150831_0106PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback