CA SB588 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 80, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 80, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 999.5 of, and to add Section 999.7 to, the Military and Veterans Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Public contracts: Disabled Veteran Business Enterprise Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-27 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB588 Archuleta et al. Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - SB 588 Archuleta Senate Third Reading By Irwin (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB588 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Result (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - SB 588 Archuleta Senate Third Reading By Irwin (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB588 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Result (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 80, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-01 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 4349.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5176.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Irwin. |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 14. Page 3066.) |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 9). |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and A. & A.R. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1278.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1104.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 807.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 620.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on G.O. and V.A. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 999.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 999.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |