CA SB588 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-25 - June 25 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-25 - June 25 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6601 and 6602 of, to amend and renumber Sections 6612, 6614, and 6618 of, to amend, renumber, and add Section 6605 of, to add Sections 6607 and 6608 to, to repeal Sections 6610, 6613, 6615, 6616, 6617, 6619, 6620, and 6621 of, to repeal the headings of Article 1 (commencing with Section 6600) and Article 2 (commencing with Section 6610) of Chapter 5.5 of Part 1 of Division 6 of, and to repeal and add Sections 6603, 6604, and 6611 of, the Fish and Game Code, and to amend Sections 71550, 71551, and 71560 of the Public Resources Code, relating to ocean resources, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Marine resources and preservation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB588 Hertzberg (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB588 Hertzberg (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Assembly | June 25 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on W.,P., & W. and NAT. RES. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 4. Page 1274.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1187.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and JUD. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 6601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 6602 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 6605 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 6610 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 6613 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 6615 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 6616 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 6617 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 6619 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 6620 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 6621 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 71550 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 71551 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 71560 | Amended Code | Citation Text |