CA SB586 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 529, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 529, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 76004 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
College and Career Access Pathways partnerships.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB586 Roth Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 586 Roth Senate Third Reading By Holden (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-22 - Assembly - SB 586 Roth Senate Third Reading By Holden (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB586 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 586 Roth Senate Third Reading By Holden (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-22 - Assembly - SB 586 Roth Senate Third Reading By Holden (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB586 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 529, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2869.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3344.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed and ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2804.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | (Received at desk July 19 pursuant to JR 61(a)(11)). |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 10). |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and ED. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 746.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 548.) (April 3). |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 76004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |