CA SB584 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 718 to the Public Resources Code, and to add Sections 764.5, 764.7, and 764.9 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electricity: undergrounding of electrical wires.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateMay 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2019-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-04-29SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 778.) (April 23).
2019-04-11SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2019-04-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 651.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2019-03-27SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2019-03-27SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and N.R. & W.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code718New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code764.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code764.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code764.9New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback