CA SB582 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 672, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 25503.6 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverages: tied-house restrictions: advertising.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB582 Bradford et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Assembly - SB 582 Bradford Senate Third Reading By BURKE (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB582 Bradford et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 672, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-11 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-21SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m.
2017-09-14SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2928.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-14SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-09-13AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3525.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-09-08AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-09-08AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2017-08-31AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-08-31AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2017-08-21AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-08-21AssemblyFrom consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon.
2017-07-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-07-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19).
2017-07-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2017-04-20AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-04-20SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 767.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-04-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2017-03-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-08SenateSet for hearing March 28.
2017-03-02SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code25503.6Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback