CA SB581 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-01 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Chau.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-01 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Chau.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65400 of the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
General plan.
Sponsors
Sen. Toni Atkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB581 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB581 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Chau. |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 30). |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1061.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 815.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |