CA SB581 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-21 - August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 30 @ 9:00 am Assembly Appropriations Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 26055.2 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis: licensing: public records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB581 Caballero (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-21AssemblyAugust 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-08-13AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-08-12Assembly(Received at desk July 17 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)).
2019-08-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 10).
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1243.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1104.) (May 16).
2019-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-04-25SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 799.) (April 23).
2019-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2019-04-10SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-04-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 599.) (April 8).
2019-03-28SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-03-19SenateSet for hearing April 8.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code26055.2New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback