CA SB580 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 22454 of, to add Sections 22454.3 and 22454.7 to, and to repeal and add Section 22454.5 of, the Vehicle Code, relating to schoolbuses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schoolbuses: stop signal arm enforcement system.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-01SenateReturned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2023-04-11SenateApril 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2023-03-21SenateSet for hearing April 11.
2023-02-22SenateReferred to Coms. on TRANS. and ED.
2023-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2023-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code22454Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code22454.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code22454.7New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback