CA SB580 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 709, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 709, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 54237 and 54237.7 of the Government Code, relating to surplus residential property, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Surplus residential property: affordable housing: historic buildings.
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Liu [D] | Asm. Chris Holden [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB580 Liu Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 580 Liu Third Reading Urgency By HOLDEN (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 580 Liu Senate Third Reading By HOLDEN (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Special Consent #1 SB580 Liu (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 580 Liu Third Reading Urgency By HOLDEN (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 580 Liu Senate Third Reading By HOLDEN (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Special Consent #1 SB580 Liu (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 709, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5428.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5900.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-01-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | From inactive file on motion of Senator Liu. Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Liu. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 2960.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-04 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Cristina Garcia. |
2015-07-13 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Cristina Garcia. |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8). |
2015-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1031.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 884.) (May 4). |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 732.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | April 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 14. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 54237 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54237.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |