CA SB579 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 802, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 802, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 230.8 and 233 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employees: time off.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-02 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB579 Jackson Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Assembly - SB 579 Jackson Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, C (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB579 Jackson (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Assembly - SB 579 Jackson Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, C (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB579 Jackson (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 802, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2423.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2728.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19). |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 1330.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 729.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 230.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 233 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 245.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 246.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |