CA SB578 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 153, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 153, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11241, 11242, 11242.1, 11256, and 11267 of, and to add and repeal Section 11245.1 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to time-shares.
Title
Vacation Ownership and Time-share Act of 2004: incentives.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-07-08 - Assembly - SB 578 Jones Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB578 Jones (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB578 Jones (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 153, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-07-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2574.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 961.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | (Corrected April 30). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 653.) (April 9). |
2019-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 11241 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 11242 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 11242.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 11245.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 11256 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 11267 | Amended Code | Citation Text |