CA SB578 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-08-27 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-08-27 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17433.5 of the Family Code, relating to child support.
Title
Child support: interest.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-02 - Senate - Special Consent #7 SB578 Wright (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-02 - Senate - Special Consent #7 SB578 Wright (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-27 | Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |
2009-07-08 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-06-26 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-06-25 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 23.) | |
2009-06-15 | To Com. on JUD. | |
2009-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1148.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-28 | Read second time. To third reading. To Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-05-27 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 1026.) | |
2009-05-19 | Set for hearing May 26. | |
2009-05-14 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-05-08 | Set for hearing May 18. | |
2009-04-29 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 702.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-21 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2009-04-16 | Set for hearing April 28. | |
2009-04-15 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-04-03 | Set for hearing April 21. | |
2009-03-19 | To Com. on JUD. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-02-28 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |