CA SB576 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 374, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 31113 of, and to add Section 35616 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to coastal resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coastal resources: Climate Ready Program and coastal climate change adaptation, infrastructure, and readiness program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB576 Umberg Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 576 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Petrie-Norris (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB576 Umberg (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 374, Statutes of 2019.
2019-09-27 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-19SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2019-09-12SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 5. Page 2882.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-10SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 3323.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-06AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-09-06AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (August 30).
2019-08-21AssemblyAugust 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-01AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-06-20AssemblyJune 24 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-05-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-28SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 1340.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-21SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1103.) (May 16).
2019-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-05-02SenateMay 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-04-26SenateSet for hearing May 6.
2019-04-23SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 623.) (April 9).
2019-03-13SenateSet for hearing April 9.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code31113Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code31121New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code35616New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback