CA SB575 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - July 2 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 102356 of, to add Section 102250 to, and to add and repeal Section 102233.1 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to underage marriage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marriage: underage marriage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB575 Wahab (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-02AssemblyJuly 2 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2024-06-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-06-04AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2024-04-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2024-01-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2024-01-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3050.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2024-01-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-01-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3011.) (January 18).
2024-01-17SenateSet for hearing January 18.
2024-01-16SenateJanuary 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2024-01-12SenateSet for hearing January 16.
2024-01-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-01-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2980.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-01-04SenateSet for hearing January 11.
2024-01-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2024-01-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2023-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2023-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2023-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code102233.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code102250New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code102356Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback