CA SB575 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-13 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 69433.9, 69436, and 69514 of the Education Code, relating to Cal Grants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cal Grants: student eligibility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB575 Bradford et al. Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 575 Bradford Senate Third Reading By Carrillo (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB575 Bradford (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-13 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2019-10-13 Vetoed by the Governor.
2019-09-19SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2019-09-11SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 2838.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-09SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 5. Page 3194.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-05AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-09-05AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (August 30).
2019-08-30AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-07-10AssemblyJuly 10 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2019-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 1190.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1103.) (May 16).
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-04-29SenateApril 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-18SenateSet for hearing April 29.
2019-04-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 649.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-08SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code69433.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69436Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69514Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback