CA SB572 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 335, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 335, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 90.8 to the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Labor Commissioner: enforcement: lien on real property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-01 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB572 Hertzberg Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Assembly - SB 572 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By Davies (Y: 68 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB572 Hertzberg (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Assembly - SB 572 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By Davies (Y: 68 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB572 Hertzberg (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 335, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2280.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 6. Page 2566.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (July 14). |
2021-07-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1057.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 860.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 671.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 90.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |