CA SB572 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17388, 17389, and 17390 of the Education Code, relating to school facilities.
Title
School facilities: school district advisory committee: use or disposition of school buildings: school closures.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB572 Pan (Y: 17 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB572 Pan Reconsider (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB572 Pan Reconsider (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Pan. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 17. Noes 19. Page 1263.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Pan. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1263.) |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1156.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 647.) (April 15). |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | April 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 17388 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 17389 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 17390 | Amended Code | Citation Text |