CA SB570 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 125055 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Prenatal screening program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB570 Becker et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB570 Becker et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-01 | Assembly | September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2023-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-07-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 11). |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1302.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1175.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | April 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 575.) (March 29). |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 125055 | Amended Code | Citation Text |