CA SB570 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 494, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 494, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 44099 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to air pollution.
Title
San Joaquin Valley Unified Air Pollution Control
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-01 - Assembly - SB 570 Rubio Senate Third Reading By PEREA (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB570 Rubio (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB570 Rubio (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 494, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m. | |
2011-09-01 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-09-01 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2778.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-08-26 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-07-07 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-06-21 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-09 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2011-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1229.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-27 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-26 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 1119.) (May 26). | |
2011-05-20 | Set for hearing May 26. | |
2011-05-16 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-05-06 | Set for hearing May 16. | |
2011-05-03 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 855.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-25 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. Set for hearing May 2. | |
2011-04-14 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 644.) (April 12). | |
2011-04-01 | Set for hearing April 12. | |
2011-03-31 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-03-21 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2011-03-09 | Set for hearing April 5. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 44099 | Amended Code | Citation Text |