CA SB570 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8880.4, 8880.56, 8880.64, 8880.65, and to repeal Section 8880.63 of the Government Code, relating to the California State Lottery, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
California State Lottery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2009-08-24 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-08-19 | Set for hearing August 25. | |
2009-07-06 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-07-03 | Set for hearing July 8. | |
2009-07-02 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2009-06-29 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-04-21 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-04-17 | Set for hearing April 27. | |
2009-04-15 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 499.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-02 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. Set for hearing April 14. | |
2009-03-31 | Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-03-24 | Set for hearing March 31. | |
2009-03-12 | To Com. on T. & H. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-02-28 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |