CA SB57 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 11376.6 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled substances: overdose prevention program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-04-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 6).
2021-03-25SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-03-12SenateSet for hearing April 6.
2021-03-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-03-01SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-02-18SenateSet for hearing March 10.
2021-01-28SenateReferral to Com. on JUD. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus.
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Coms. on HEALTH, PUB. S., and JUD.
2020-12-08SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
2020-12-07SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code11376.6Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback