CA SB567 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-04 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 3212.13 and 3212.14 to the Labor Code, relating to workers’ compensation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers’ compensation: hospital employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [04-24-2019]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-04SenateReturned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2020-01-08SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2019-04-24SenateApril 24 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 2. Page 801.) Reconsideration granted.
2019-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code3212.13New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code3212.14New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback