CA SB564 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 29, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 29, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 26720.9, 26721.2, 26722, 26723, 26725.1, 26726, 26727, 26728.1, 26729, 26730, 26731, 26733.5, 26736, 26738, 26740, 26741, 26744.5, 26746, 26746.1, and 26750 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Sheriffs and marshals: fees.
Sponsors
Sen. John Laird [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-19 - Assembly - SB 564 Laird Senate Third Reading By Maienschein (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB564 Laird (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB564 Laird (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 29, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-06-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-06-23 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. | |
2023-06-20 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-06-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2288.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 6). |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-05-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1071.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 686.) (April 11). |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 26720.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 26721.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 26722 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 26723 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 26725.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 26726 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 26727 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 26728.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 26729 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 26730 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 26731 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 26733.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 26736 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 26738 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 26740 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 26741 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 26744.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 26746 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 26746.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 26750 | Amended Code | Citation Text |