CA SB564 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 430, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 430, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 6588.8 to, and to repeal and amend Section 6586.7 of, the Government Code, relating to water.
Title
Joint powers authorities: Water Bill Savings Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike McGuire [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB564 McGuire et al. Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Assembly - SB 564 McGuire Senate Third Reading By WOOD (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB564 McGuire et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Assembly - SB 564 McGuire Senate Third Reading By WOOD (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB564 McGuire et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 430, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-18 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2785.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3032.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-07-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 12). |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 797.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Published April 18 at 9 p.m. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 623.) (April 5). |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 6586.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 6588.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |