CA SB563 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 53398.69 and 53398.75.7 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Second Neighborhood Infill Finance and Transit Improvements Act: housing developments: homelessness prevention programs: enhanced infrastructure financing plan review and amendment process.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | May 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 17. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 987.) (April 29). |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 728.) (April 8). |
2021-04-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HOUSING. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53398.69 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53398.75.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |