CA SB562 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and V.A.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 205.5 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property taxation: exemption: principal residence: veterans and their unmarried surviving spouses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB562 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans old" title="No Votes Recorded">No Votes Recorded: (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and V.A.
2019-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1282.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-21SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1103.) (May 16).
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-06SenateMay 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-26SenateSet for hearing May 6.
2019-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 807.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-10SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2019-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 550.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
2019-03-27SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2019-03-25SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-03-21SenateMarch 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-03-19SenateSet for hearing March 27.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and V.A.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code205.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback