CA SB561 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-28 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-28 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to community services districts.
Title
Fallen Leaf Lake Community Services District: State audit.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Gaines [R] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Redistricting] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB561 Gaines et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB561 Gaines et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | June 27 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 20). |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and E. & R. |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4125.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4043.) (January 16). |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Set for hearing January 16. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4020.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Set for hearing January 10. |
2017-07-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | April 26 hearing: Heard for testimony only. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | April 5 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E. & C.A. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 61049 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 61108 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 61260 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |