CA SB556 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Referred to Com. on B. & P.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Referred to Com. on B. & P.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 8728.5 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Professional land surveyors and engineers.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] | Asm. Rudy Salas [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB556 Pan et al (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 1329.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1103.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 769.) (April 22). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | April 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 8728.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |