CA SB552 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 481, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 481, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 25160.8, 25218.1, 25218.5, and 25404 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous waste.
Title
Hazardous waste: household hazardous waste: door-to-door collection programs: residential pickup services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB552 Archuleta Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 552 Archuleta Senate Third Reading By Luz Rivas (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB552 Archuleta (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 552 Archuleta Senate Third Reading By Luz Rivas (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB552 Archuleta (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 481, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2866.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3259.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21). |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 962.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 872.) (April 29). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 550.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25160.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25218.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25218.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25404 | Amended Code | Citation Text |