CA SB551 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-26 - August 26 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-26 - August 26 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Chapter 1.8 (commencing with Section 12100.500) of Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to electric vehicles.
Title
California Zero-Emission Vehicle Authority.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] | Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D] |
Sen. Dave Min [D] | Sen. Susan Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB551 Stern et al (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB551 Stern et al (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-26 | Assembly | August 26 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 5). |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 30). |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and TRANS. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 1284.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1196.) (May 20). |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 17. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 2. Page 942.) (April 27). |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 10. Noes 3. Page 684.) (April 6). |
2021-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referral to Com. on E., U. & C. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O., TRANS., and E., U. & C. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12100.500 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |