CA SB551 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 63089.1, 63089.4, 63089.5, and 63089.98 of, to add Sections 63089.642 and 63089.644 to, and to add Article 12 (commencing with Section 63090) and Article 13 (commencing with Section 63095) to, Chapter 6 of Division 1 of Title 6.7 of, the Government Code, relating to the Capital Access Loan Program and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Capital Access Loan Program for Small Businesses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Banking and Finance] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Banking and Finance] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB551 Hueso (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16AssemblyAugust 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2018-06-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-06-21AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 19).
2018-06-13AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
2017-09-11AssemblyRe-referred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and B. & F. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2017-09-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
2017-07-10AssemblyJuly 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-27AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
2017-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 20).
2017-06-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
2017-05-26AssemblyReferred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and B. & F.
2017-05-04AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-04SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 954.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 913.) (May 1).
2017-04-21SenateSet for hearing May 1.
2017-04-18SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-18SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2017-04-17SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2017-04-07SenateSet for hearing April 19 in EQ. pending receipt.
2017-04-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 620.) (April 5).
2017-03-27SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
2017-03-10SenateSet for hearing April 5.
2017-03-02SenateReferred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and EQ.
2017-02-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
2017-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code63089.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code63089.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code63089.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code63089.51Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code63089.642New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code63089.644New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code63089.646New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code63089.98Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code63090New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code44559.16New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code44559.4Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback