CA SB55 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-27 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-27 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 9118, 9215, and 9310 of the Elections Code, to amend Sections 65009 and 66499.37 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 21000, 21001, 21001.1, 21002, 21092.5, 21167, 21167.1, 21167.4, 21167.6, 21167.8, and 21177 of, to add Sections 21167.1.5 and 21167.8.5 to, to add and repeal Section 21080.51 of, and to repeal Sections 21080.04, 21168.6.5, and 21168.6.6 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: housing and land use.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB55 Jackson et al (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-07-09 | Assembly | July 9 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-25 | Assembly | June 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 1244.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1088.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 440.) (March 26). |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing March 26. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Read first time. |
2018-12-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 12. |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |