CA SB55 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 8490.7 of the Education Code, relating to after school programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

After school programs: The Distinguished After School Health Recognition Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # SB55 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Amendments (Committee's) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-01AssemblySeptember 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2017-06-28AssemblyJune 28 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-06-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1353.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1177.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-04-03SenateApril 3 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-03-24SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2017-03-15SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 370.) (March 8).
2017-02-23SenateSet for hearing March 8.
2017-01-12SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2016-12-06SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
2016-12-05SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code8490.7Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback