CA SB549 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-27 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-27 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 10005 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Social workers: essential workers.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB549 Jones Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - SB 549 Jones Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB549 Jones Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - SB 549 Jones Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB549 Jones Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-27 | Senate | Veto sustained. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Stricken from file. |
2021-10-04 | Senate | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2021-10-04 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2021-09-03 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2216.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2524.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 19). |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-23 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and HUM. S. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 974.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 858.) (April 20). |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 671.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and HUMAN S. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10005 | New Code | See Bill Text |