CA SB544 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 216, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 11124 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 11123.5 of, and to add and repeal Section 11123.2 of, the Government Code, relating to state government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bagley-Keene Open Meeting Act: teleconferencing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB544 Laird Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Assembly - SB 544 Laird Senate Third Reading By Berman (Y: 50 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB544 Laird (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-09-22 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 216, Statutes of 2023.
2023-09-22 Approved by the Governor.
2023-09-15 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2023-09-14SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 5. Page 2793.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2023-09-13SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2023-09-13AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 15. Page 3354.) Ordered to the Senate.
2023-09-08AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2023-09-08AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2023-09-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-09-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (September 1).
2023-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 hearing postponed by committee.
2023-08-14AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-07-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (July 12).
2023-05-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2023-05-15AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2023-05-15SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 3. Page 1079.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2023-05-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-08SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2023-05-02SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2023-04-27SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 894.) (April 25).
2023-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2023-04-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 1. Page 656.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2023-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 11.
2023-03-29SenateRe-referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
2023-03-20SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2023-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2023-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2023-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code11123.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code11124Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB544
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB544#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB544#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB544#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB544#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB544#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB544#94ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB544#93CHP
Roll Callhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB544

Bill Comments

feedback